Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 06/16/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 06/16/2011
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 06/16/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/27/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/13/2011
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 07/20/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/21/2011
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/21/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/25/2011