Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 06/20/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/29/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 07/12/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/20/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/21/2011
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 10/12/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 11/01/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 12/12/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 01/26/2012