Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 06/21/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/06/2011
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/06/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 09/06/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/06/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 09/06/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 09/06/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 09/08/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/08/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 09/08/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 09/08/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 09/09/2011
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/12/2011