There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

SAVE Act
Save Our Industries Act of 2011

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for preferential duty treatment to certain apparel articles of the Philippines.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/22/2011Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
06/22/2011Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4026-4028)
Action By: Senate
06/22/2011Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S4025-4026)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (9)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 06/22/2011
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 06/22/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 06/22/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/19/2012
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 04/19/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/25/2012
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/07/2012
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 11/13/2012
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 12/20/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance06/22/2011 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1244. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/22/2011)

Save Our Industries Act of 2011 or SAVE Act - Grants duty-free treatment, subject to specified conditions, to certain apparel wholly assembled in the United States or the Philippines, or both, and components of such apparel consisting entirely of: (1) fabric cut in the United States or the Philippines, or both, from fabric wholly formed in the United States from yarns wholly formed in the United States; (2) components knit-to-shape in the United States from yarns wholly formed in the United States; or (3) any combination of such fabric or components.

Prescribes single transformation duty-free rules for specified apparel articles, regardless of the source of the fabric, fabric components, components knit-to-shape, or yarns from which the articles are made, if they: (1) are cut and wholly assembled, or knit-to-shape, in the Philippines from any combination of such components; and (2) are imported directly into the United States from the Philippines.

Prescribes requirements for review and enforcement of the program.

Prescribes penalties for exporters and importers who engage in the transshipment of apparel that has been afforded preferential treatment under this Act.