Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 06/22/2011
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 06/22/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 06/22/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/19/2012
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 04/19/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/25/2012
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/07/2012
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 11/13/2012
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 12/20/2012