Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 06/22/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 07/18/2011
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 07/18/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 08/01/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 01/23/2012
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 06/29/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 11/27/2012