There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Target Practice and Marksmanship Training Support Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Pittman-Robertson Wildlife Restoration Act to facilitate the establishment of additional or expanded public target ranges in certain States.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/22/2011Introduced in Senate

All Actions (3)

Date
04/24/2012Committee on Environment and Public Works Senate Subcommittee on Water and Wildlife. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 112-968.
Action By: Senate Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Water and Wildlife
06/22/2011Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4029-4030)
Action By: Senate
06/22/2011Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S4029)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (8)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 06/22/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 06/22/2011
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 06/22/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay R. [D-NC] 06/23/2011
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 11/15/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 11/15/2011
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 11/29/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 02/14/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Environment and Public Works06/22/2011 Referred to
Senate Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Water and Wildlife04/24/2012 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1249. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/22/2011)

Target Practice and Marksmanship Training Support Act - Amends the Pittman-Robertson Wildlife Restoration Act to: (1) authorize a state to pay up to 90% of the costs of acquiring land for, expanding, or constructing a public target range; (2) authorize a state to elect to allocate 10% of a specified amount apportioned to it from the federal aid to wildlife restoration fund for such costs; (3) limit the federal share of such costs under such Act to 90%; and (4) require amounts provided for such costs under such Act to remain available for expenditure and obligation for five fiscal years.

Shields the United States from any civil action or claim for money damages for injury to or loss of property, personal injury, or death caused by an activity occurring at a public target range that is funded by the federal government pursuant to such Act or located on federal land, except to the extent provided under the Federal Tort Claims Act with respect to the exercise or performance of a discretionary function.

Urges the Chief of the Forest Service and the Director of the Bureau of Land Management (BLM) to cooperate with state and local authorities and other entities to carry out waste removal and other activities on any federal land used as a public target range to encourage its continued use for target practice or marksmanship training.