Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 06/22/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 06/22/2011
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 06/22/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 06/23/2011
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 11/15/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 11/15/2011
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 11/29/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 02/14/2012