Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 06/22/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 06/22/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 06/22/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 06/22/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 06/22/2011
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 06/22/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 06/22/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/23/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/28/2011
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/27/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 07/25/2012