Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 06/23/2011
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 06/23/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 02/02/2012
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 02/02/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 02/07/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 02/09/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/27/2012
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/24/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/31/2012
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/31/2012
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 11/13/2012