Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 06/27/2011
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/07/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 08/01/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 08/01/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 10/12/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 10/12/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 12/07/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/22/2012
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/21/2012