Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 06/29/2011
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 06/29/2011
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 06/29/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 06/29/2011
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 06/29/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 06/30/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/30/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 06/30/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 06/30/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 06/30/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/06/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/06/2011
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/06/2011
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/06/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 07/07/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 07/13/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 07/13/2011
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 07/13/2011
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 07/13/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/19/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/22/2011
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 08/02/2011
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 11/29/2011
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 02/28/2012
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 05/07/2012