Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 06/29/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 06/29/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 06/29/2011
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA]* 06/29/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 07/05/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 07/12/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 07/12/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 07/18/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/06/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/06/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 09/06/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/06/2011
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 09/06/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/07/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 09/13/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/19/2011
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/21/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/26/2011
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 10/03/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 10/03/2011
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 10/04/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 10/05/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 10/05/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 10/18/2011
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 11/01/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 11/10/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 11/10/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 12/06/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 01/23/2012
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 01/23/2012
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 01/23/2012
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 01/30/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 02/01/2012
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 02/13/2012
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/27/2012
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 02/29/2012
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 02/29/2012
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/02/2012
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/19/2012
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/20/2012
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 03/27/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 04/16/2012
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 04/17/2012
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 04/25/2012
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/08/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/08/2012
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/10/2012
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/14/2012
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/16/2012
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/22/2012
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 06/05/2012
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/18/2012
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 06/20/2012
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 06/25/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/26/2012
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 06/28/2012
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 07/10/2012
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/10/2012
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/18/2012
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 07/18/2012
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 07/23/2012
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 07/24/2012
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/25/2012
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/25/2012
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 07/25/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 07/25/2012
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 07/25/2012
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 07/25/2012
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/26/2012