Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA]* 06/29/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 06/29/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 06/29/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 06/29/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 06/29/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/07/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 07/14/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/19/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 07/20/2011
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/12/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/13/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 09/15/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 09/15/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 09/20/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/22/2011
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 09/26/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/03/2011
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 10/04/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 10/11/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 10/11/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 10/12/2011
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 10/13/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 10/13/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 10/13/2011
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 10/17/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 10/17/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 10/17/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 10/18/2011
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 10/31/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 11/02/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 11/07/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 12/05/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 01/24/2012
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/05/2012
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/07/2012
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/07/2012
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/08/2012
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 03/19/2012
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 03/27/2012
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 04/26/2012
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/26/2012
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/10/2012
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/06/2012
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 06/07/2012
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/27/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/29/2012
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/10/2012
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/10/2012
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/13/2012
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/20/2012
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 09/20/2012
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 09/21/2012
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 11/27/2012
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 11/27/2012
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 12/18/2012
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 12/20/2012