Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 06/30/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 01/30/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 01/31/2012
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/26/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/10/2012
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/06/2012
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/19/2012