Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 07/13/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 07/20/2011
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 08/01/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 08/01/2011
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 08/02/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 09/06/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 10/17/2011
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 01/26/2012
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 02/06/2012
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 02/06/2012
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/27/2012
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/18/2012
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/13/2012