There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Captive Primate Safety Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Captive Primate Safety Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Lacey Act Amendments of 1981 to prohibit the importation, exportation, transportation, and sale, receipt, acquisition, or purchase in interstate or foreign commerce, of any live animal of any prohibited wildlife species, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
07/17/2012 Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Boxer without amendment. With written report No. 112-188.
07/05/2011 Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date
07/17/2012 Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 456.
Action By: Senate
07/17/2012 Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Boxer without amendment. With written report No. 112-188.
Action By: Committee on Environment and Public Works
06/21/2012 Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Environment and Public Works
07/05/2011 Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 07/05/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 07/05/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 07/14/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 07/14/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 08/01/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/13/2012
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Sponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/20/2011 09/21/2011

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Environment and Public Works07/05/2011 Referred to
06/21/2012 Markup by
07/17/2012 Reported by S. Rept. 112-188

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (8)

  • Administrative law and regulatory procedures
  • Animal protection and human-animal relationships
  • Crimes against animals and natural resources
  • Department of the Interior
  • Mammals
  • Smuggling and trafficking
  • Wildlife conservation and habitat protection

Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1324. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate without amendment (07/17/2012)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Captive Primate Safety Act - Amends the Lacey Act Amendments of 1981 to add nonhuman primates to the definition of "prohibited wildlife species" for purposes of the prohibition against the sale or purchase of such species in interstate or foreign commerce.

Makes it unlawful for a person to import, export, transport, sell, receive, acquire, or purchase a live animal of any prohibited wildlife species in interstate or foreign commerce (i.e., for pet trade purposes). Sets forth exceptions to such prohibition, including, under certain conditions, for: (1) transporting a nonhuman primate to or from a veterinarian, (2) transporting a nonhuman primate to a legally designated caregiver as a result of the death of the preceding owner, and (3) transporting a single primate of the genus Cebus that was obtained from and trained by a charitable organization to assist a permanently disabled individual with a severe mobility impairment.

Sets forth civil and criminal penalties for violations of the requirements of this Act. Extends the authorization of appropriations to carry out such prohibition for FY2011-FY2015.