Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 01/31/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 02/17/2011
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 02/28/2011
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 07/13/2011