There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Pilot's Bill of Rights

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Pilot's Bill of Rights

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Pilot's Bill of Rights

Short Titles as Introduced

Pilot's Bill of Rights

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 49, United States Code, to provide rights for pilots, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
08/03/2012Became Public Law No: 112-153. (TXT | PDF)
08/03/2012Signed by President.
07/26/2012Presented to President.
07/23/2012Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5100-5101)
06/29/2012Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
06/29/2012Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/06/2011Introduced in Senate

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
08/03/2012Became Public Law No: 112-153. (TXT | PDF)
08/03/2012Signed by President.
07/26/2012SenatePresented to President.
07/23/2012-5:18pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/23/2012-5:18pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5100-5101)
07/23/2012-5:11pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1335.
07/23/2012-5:11pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5100-5102)
07/23/2012-5:10pmHouseMr. Bucshon moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
06/29/2012HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
06/29/2012SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/29/2012-2:46pmHouseReceived in the House.
06/29/2012SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
06/29/2012SenateS.Amdt.2489 Amendment SA 2489 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
06/29/2012SenateS.Amdt.2489 Amendment SA 2489 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Hutchison. (consideration: CR S4733-4735; text: CR S4733-4735) In the nature of a substitute.
06/29/2012SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4733-4735)
06/29/2012SenateSenate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/06/2011SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
07/06/2011SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S4400-4401)

Cosponsors (65)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 07/14/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/14/2011
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 07/27/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 07/29/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 09/08/2011
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 09/08/2011
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 09/08/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/15/2011
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 10/06/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/17/2011
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 10/17/2011
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 10/17/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 10/17/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 10/17/2011
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 10/17/2011
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 10/31/2011
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 10/31/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 11/02/2011
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 11/09/2011
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 11/09/2011
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 11/09/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 11/14/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 11/14/2011
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 11/14/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 11/14/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 11/16/2011
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 11/16/2011
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 11/16/2011
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 11/16/2011
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 11/16/2011
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 11/16/2011
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 11/16/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay R. [D-NC] 11/17/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 11/17/2011
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 02/06/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 02/09/2012
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 03/13/2012
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 05/16/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/17/2012
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/05/2012

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation07/06/2011 Referred to
06/29/2012 Discharged from
House Transportation and Infrastructure06/29/2012 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.1335. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-153 (08/03/2012)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on June 29, 2012. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Pilot's Bill of Rights - Requires National Transportation Safety Board (NTSB) proceedings for the review of decisions of the Administrator of the Federal Aviation Administration (FAA) to deny, amend, modify, suspend, or revoke an airman's certificate to be conducted, to the extent practicable, in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Federal Rules of Evidence.

Requires the Administrator to: (1) provide timely, written notification to the subject of an investigation involving the approval, denial, suspension, modification, or revocation of an airman certificate of specified information pertinent to the investigation; and (2) provide him or her with access to relevant air traffic data. Authorizes the Administrator to delay such notification if it threatens the integrity of the investigation.

Allows a substantially affected individual to elect to file an appeal of a certificate denial, a punitive civil action, or an emergency order of revocation in the U.S. district court in which individual resides, in which the action in question occurred, or the district court for the District of Columbia. Allows a substantially affected individual who elects not to file an appeal in a U.S. district court to file such appeal in the appropriate U.S. court of appeals.

Directs the Administrator to begin a Notice to Airmen (NOTAM) Improvement Program to improve the system of providing airmen with pertinent and timely information before a flight in the national airspace system. Requires the Administrator to establish a NOTAM Improvement Panel composed of representatives of relevant nonprofit and not-for-profit general aviation pilot groups to advise the Administrator in carrying out program goals.

Requires the Comptroller General to: (1) assess the FAA process for the medical certification of airmen; and (2) report to Congress on revisions to the medical application form, the alignment of medical qualification policies with present-day qualified medical judgment and practices, and steps that could be taken to promote the public's understanding of the medical requirements determining an airman's medical certificate eligibility.