Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 07/06/2011
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 07/14/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/14/2011
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 07/27/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 07/29/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 09/08/2011
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 09/08/2011
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 09/08/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/15/2011
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 10/06/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/17/2011
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 10/17/2011
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 10/17/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 10/17/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 10/17/2011
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 10/17/2011
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 10/31/2011
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 10/31/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 11/02/2011
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 11/09/2011
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 11/09/2011
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 11/09/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 11/14/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 11/14/2011
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 11/14/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 11/14/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 11/16/2011
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 11/16/2011
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 11/16/2011
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 11/16/2011
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 11/16/2011
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 11/16/2011
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 11/16/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 11/17/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 11/17/2011
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 02/06/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 02/09/2012
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 03/13/2012
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 05/16/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/17/2012
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/05/2012