Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 07/07/2011
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 07/07/2011
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC]* 07/07/2011
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 07/07/2011
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 07/07/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 07/07/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 07/07/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 07/07/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 07/07/2011
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 07/07/2011
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 07/07/2011
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 07/07/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 07/07/2011
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 07/07/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 07/07/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 07/07/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 07/07/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 07/07/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 07/07/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 07/07/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/13/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 07/13/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 07/13/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/13/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/13/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 07/13/2011
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 07/14/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 07/14/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 07/14/2011
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 07/14/2011
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/14/2011
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 07/14/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 07/18/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/18/2011
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/18/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 07/18/2011
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 07/18/2011
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 07/20/2011
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 07/20/2011