Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 07/12/2011
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 07/12/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 07/12/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 07/26/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/27/2011
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/26/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 10/18/2011
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 11/10/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 11/17/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 12/06/2011
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 12/06/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 03/05/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/20/2012
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 11/26/2012