Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 07/13/2011
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/26/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 07/28/2011
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 07/29/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 09/06/2011