Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 07/13/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 07/13/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 07/13/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 07/13/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 07/13/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/18/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/18/2011
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 07/18/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 12/06/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 01/24/2012
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 01/24/2012
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 01/26/2012