Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 07/13/2011
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 07/13/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 07/14/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 09/15/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/19/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 03/21/2012
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 07/31/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 09/21/2012