Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 07/14/2011
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/21/2011
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 07/21/2011
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 08/01/2011
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 09/13/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 01/30/2012
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 04/17/2012
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 05/09/2012
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 06/21/2012
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 07/23/2012