There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to terminate the $1 presidential coin program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/19/2011Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
07/19/2011Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC]* 07/19/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/26/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 10/18/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 10/19/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/12/2012
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 08/02/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 08/02/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs07/19/2011 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1385. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (07/19/2011)

Terminates the program for redesign and issuance of circulating $1 coins honoring each of the Presidents of the United States (Presidential $1 Coin Program).