Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC]* 07/19/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/26/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 10/18/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 10/19/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/12/2012
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 08/02/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 08/02/2012