Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 07/20/2011
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 07/20/2011
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 07/20/2011
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 07/20/2011
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 07/20/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 07/21/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/21/2011
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 07/21/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/21/2011
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 07/21/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 07/21/2011
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 07/21/2011
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/25/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 07/25/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/27/2011
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/27/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 07/27/2011
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/27/2011
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 07/28/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/28/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 07/28/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 08/02/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/06/2011
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 09/06/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 09/12/2011
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 09/12/2011
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 09/14/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 09/15/2011
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 09/20/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 09/21/2011
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/23/2011
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 10/05/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 10/06/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 10/06/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/06/2011
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 10/18/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 10/18/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 10/20/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 11/02/2011
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 12/06/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 12/15/2011