Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 07/21/2011
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 07/21/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 07/21/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 07/21/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 07/21/2011
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 07/21/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 07/21/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 07/21/2011
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 07/22/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 07/25/2011
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 07/25/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/26/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 07/29/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 07/29/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 07/29/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 08/02/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/07/2011