Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 07/26/2011
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/23/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/23/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/23/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 09/23/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 10/03/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 10/03/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/05/2011
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 11/08/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 11/10/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 11/17/2011
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 11/17/2011
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 11/28/2011
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 11/30/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/02/2012
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 02/27/2012
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/14/2012
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/15/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/27/2012
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/29/2012
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/07/2012
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/24/2012