Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 08/01/2011
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 09/20/2011
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 11/29/2011
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 01/26/2012
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 02/07/2012
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 03/05/2012
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 05/08/2012
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/14/2012
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 05/24/2012
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 06/12/2012
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 06/13/2012
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 08/01/2012
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 09/19/2012