Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 08/02/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 08/02/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 09/06/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 09/06/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 09/06/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 09/07/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 09/09/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 09/12/2011
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 09/14/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 10/05/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 10/05/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 10/05/2011
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 10/05/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 10/05/2011
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 10/05/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 10/05/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 10/05/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 10/05/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 10/05/2011
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 10/17/2011
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 10/19/2011
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 10/20/2011
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 10/31/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 01/26/2012
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 01/31/2012
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 02/01/2012
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 02/01/2012
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 02/01/2012
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 02/07/2012
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 02/07/2012
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 02/07/2012
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 02/09/2012
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 02/09/2012
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 02/09/2012
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 02/09/2012
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 02/09/2012
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 02/14/2012