Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 08/02/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 08/02/2011
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 09/08/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/09/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 09/13/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 09/14/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 09/15/2011
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 09/19/2011
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 09/21/2011
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 10/04/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 10/12/2011
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 11/01/2011