Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 08/02/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 08/02/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 08/02/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 08/02/2011
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/21/2011
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 10/13/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 11/01/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 11/01/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 11/29/2011
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 12/14/2011
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 01/26/2012
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 02/16/2012
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/12/2012