Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 08/02/2011
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 08/02/2011
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 09/12/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 10/12/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 10/12/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 10/12/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 10/12/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 10/12/2011
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 10/12/2011
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 10/12/2011
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 10/12/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 10/12/2011
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 10/12/2011
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 10/12/2011
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 10/12/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 10/12/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 10/12/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 11/03/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 12/12/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 12/12/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 03/28/2012