Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 08/02/2011
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 08/02/2011
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 08/02/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/12/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 09/12/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 09/13/2011
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 09/16/2011
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 09/16/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/16/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 09/16/2011
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 09/16/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 09/16/2011
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 09/16/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 09/20/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 09/20/2011
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 09/20/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/26/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 10/11/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 10/17/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 11/01/2011
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 05/21/2012
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 06/13/2012