Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 08/02/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 08/02/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/07/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 09/07/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 09/12/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/12/2011
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/12/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 09/12/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 09/12/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/20/2011
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 09/26/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/26/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/03/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 10/03/2011
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 10/04/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 10/06/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/19/2011
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 10/19/2011