Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 09/13/2011
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 09/13/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/13/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 09/13/2011
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 09/13/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 09/13/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 09/13/2011
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 09/14/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 09/15/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/15/2011
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 09/15/2011
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 09/15/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 09/15/2011
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 09/15/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 10/17/2011
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 10/17/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 10/17/2011
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 10/17/2011
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 12/13/2011