Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 09/08/2011
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 09/08/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 09/08/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 09/08/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 09/08/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 09/08/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 09/08/2011
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 09/08/2011
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 09/08/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 09/08/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 09/08/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 09/08/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 09/08/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 09/08/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 09/08/2011
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 09/08/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 09/08/2011
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 09/08/2011
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 09/08/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 09/12/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/15/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 09/19/2011
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 09/21/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 09/22/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 10/05/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 10/11/2011