Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 09/12/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 09/12/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 09/12/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 09/12/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 09/12/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 09/12/2011
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 09/12/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 09/12/2011
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 09/12/2011
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 09/12/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 09/12/2011
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 09/12/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 09/12/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 09/12/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 09/12/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 09/12/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 09/13/2011
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 09/13/2011
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 09/14/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 09/15/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/21/2011
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 09/21/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 10/03/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 10/06/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 12/01/2011