Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 09/12/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 09/14/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 09/14/2011
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 09/19/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/19/2011
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 09/20/2011
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 09/20/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/20/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/21/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/21/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 09/21/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 09/21/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 09/21/2011
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 09/21/2011
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 09/22/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 09/22/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 10/04/2011
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 10/18/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 11/02/2011