Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 09/12/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 10/05/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 10/06/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 10/06/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 10/11/2011
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 10/11/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 10/11/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 10/12/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay R. [D-NC] 10/12/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 10/12/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 10/12/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 10/12/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 10/13/2011
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 10/13/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 10/17/2011
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 10/17/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 11/01/2011
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 11/01/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 11/10/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 11/15/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 11/17/2011