Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 09/12/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 12/01/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 12/01/2011
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 12/06/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 12/14/2011
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 03/01/2012
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 03/07/2012