Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 09/21/2011
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 09/21/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 09/21/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 10/31/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 11/01/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 11/01/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 11/18/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 11/18/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 12/08/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 01/23/2012
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 01/23/2012
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 01/30/2012
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 01/31/2012
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 02/09/2012
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 02/27/2012
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 02/27/2012
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/05/2012
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 03/06/2012
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/07/2012
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 03/12/2012
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 03/19/2012
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/27/2012
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 04/16/2012
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 04/16/2012
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 04/17/2012
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 04/18/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 04/18/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/18/2012
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 04/18/2012
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/19/2012
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/19/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/25/2012
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 05/07/2012
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/08/2012
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/09/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 05/09/2012
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/10/2012
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 05/10/2012
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 05/10/2012
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 05/14/2012
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/14/2012
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/14/2012
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/15/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/17/2012
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 05/17/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/22/2012
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 06/04/2012
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 06/05/2012
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/05/2012
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/05/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 06/05/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 06/05/2012
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 06/06/2012
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/11/2012
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/11/2012
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/11/2012
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 06/11/2012
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/12/2012
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 06/18/2012
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/18/2012
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/18/2012
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/19/2012
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 06/20/2012
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/20/2012
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 06/20/2012
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 06/20/2012
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 06/27/2012
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/28/2012
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 06/28/2012
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/29/2012