Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 09/21/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 09/21/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 09/21/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 09/21/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 09/21/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 09/21/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 09/21/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/23/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 09/26/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/26/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 11/15/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 11/18/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 11/29/2011
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 12/14/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 12/16/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 01/23/2012
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 03/19/2012
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 03/29/2012