Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 09/22/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 09/22/2011
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 09/22/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 10/19/2011
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 10/20/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 11/16/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 11/16/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 11/16/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 11/16/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 11/16/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 11/16/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 11/16/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 11/16/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 12/13/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 12/13/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 02/01/2012