Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 09/23/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/04/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 12/08/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 01/30/2012
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 01/30/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 01/30/2012
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 01/31/2012
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 01/31/2012
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 02/06/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 02/06/2012
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/27/2012
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/19/2012
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/07/2012
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/28/2012