Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/19/2011
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 05/19/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 10/17/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 12/12/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 12/12/2011
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 01/26/2012
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 01/31/2012
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 02/06/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 02/06/2012