Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 10/04/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 10/11/2011
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 10/11/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 10/17/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 10/19/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 10/19/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 10/19/2011
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 10/20/2011
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 10/31/2011
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 11/02/2011
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 11/02/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 11/08/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 11/08/2011
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 11/08/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 11/08/2011
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 11/08/2011
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 11/10/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 11/10/2011
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 11/10/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 11/15/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 12/05/2011